THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 800
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-340-6400
Fax: 416-907-1777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.P. Mayne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mayne (CPSO#: 93088 )
Business Address: Suite 225
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(647) 340-6400
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
800
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
6473406400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Suite 800
North York Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-340-6400
Fax: 416-907-1777

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.P. Mayne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Mayne (CPSO#: 93088 )
Business Address: Suite 225
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(647) 340-6400
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
800
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
6473406400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN PATRICK MAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN PATRICK MAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010