THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lam (CPSO#: 93091 )
Business Address: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 294-2290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lam (CPSO#: 93091 )
Business Address: Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
(905) 294-2290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE YAT-YEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE YAT-YEE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010