THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:34:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Munroe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munroe (CPSO#: 93094 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Address: 47 Liberty St South
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Address: 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
(905) 881-6667
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
Emergency Department
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-623-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Munroe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Munroe (CPSO#: 93094 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Address: 47 Liberty St South
Bowmanville ON L1C 2N4
(905) 623-3331
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Business Address: 2900 Steeles Avenue East
Suite 206
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
(905) 881-6667
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE MUNROE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNROE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ANNE MUNROE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNROE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010