THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:07:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2029
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Troyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Troyan (CPSO#: 93128 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Extension: 2029
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Troyan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Troyan (CPSO#: 93128 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 376-2121

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KSENIYA TROYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROYAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KSENIYA TROYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROYAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010