THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:01:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave East
Intensive Care Unit
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN-Centenary Hospital
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ray Guo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Guo (CPSO#: 93144 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN-Centenary Hospital
ICU
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-284-8131
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave East
Intensive Care Unit
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN-Centenary Hospital
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ray Guo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Guo (CPSO#: 93144 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
SHN-Centenary Hospital
ICU
ICU
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
416-284-8131
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2400
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAY GUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAY GUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010