THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, RUSSIAN, SWAHILI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213286
Fax: 9057213287
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhseen Yusuf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yusuf (CPSO#: 93161 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: The Polyclinic, Specialty Department
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160 Extn: 268
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-3286

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, RUSSIAN, SWAHILI, URDU
Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213286
Fax: 9057213287
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Muhseen Yusuf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yusuf (CPSO#: 93161 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8P5
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434
Business Address: The Polyclinic, Specialty Department
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160 Extn: 268
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-3286

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHSEEN MOHAMED YUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUSUF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHSEEN MOHAMED YUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YUSUF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010