THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Suite 101
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-6060
Fax: 905-984-6560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Baker (CPSO#: 93171 )
Business Address: 115-245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 984-6060
Business Address: 300G Fourth Ave
Suite 101
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
9059846060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Suite 101
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-6060
Fax: 905-984-6560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Baker (CPSO#: 93171 )
Business Address: 115-245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 984-6060
Business Address: 300G Fourth Ave
Suite 101
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
9059846060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY SINCLAIR BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY SINCLAIR BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010