THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7160 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 16 main street
Markham Ontario L3P1X2
Phone: 905 4715300
Fax: 905 4716130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKBER SHAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shah (CPSO#: 93187 )
Business Address: 16 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1X2

Corporation Name: Akber Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7160 Markham Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 16 main street
Markham Ontario L3P1X2
Phone: 905 4715300
Fax: 905 4716130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKBER SHAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shah (CPSO#: 93187 )
Business Address: 16 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1X2

Corporation Name: Akber Shah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKBER SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKBER SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sind Medical College, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010