THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 361 Main St. East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: (613) 632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Philippe Bercier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bercier (CPSO#: 93189 )
Business Address: 101 - 361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
(613) 632-0605
Business Address: 4289 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K1E 0A8
Business Address: 215 - 3883 Boul Saint-Jean
Dollard-Des Ormeaux Quebec H6B 2B9
(514) 624-7363
Business Address: 29 Clemow Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2B1
613-235-3535

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 361 Main St. East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: (613) 632-7073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Philippe Bercier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bercier (CPSO#: 93189 )
Business Address: 101 - 361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A8
(613) 632-0605
Business Address: 4289 Innes Road
Orléans Ontario K1E 0A8
Business Address: 215 - 3883 Boul Saint-Jean
Dollard-Des Ormeaux Quebec H6B 2B9
(514) 624-7363
Business Address: 29 Clemow Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 2B1
613-235-3535

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PHILIPPE BERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PHILIPPE BERCIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERCIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010