THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:15:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Fax: (416) 470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arielle Cheifetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheifetz (CPSO#: 93203 )
Business Address: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 470-6690
Fax: (416) 470-6691

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arielle Cheifetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cheifetz (CPSO#: 93203 )
Business Address: Bridgepoint Family Health Team
430 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2N1
(416) 470-6690

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIELLE CHEIFETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEIFETZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIELLE CHEIFETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEIFETZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010