THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 114
7777 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-605-4744
Fax: 416-987-0585

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Chi Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chow (CPSO#: 93204 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 114
7777 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L0G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-605-4744
Fax: 416-987-0585

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Chi Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chow (CPSO#: 93204 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CHI WAI CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CHI WAI CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Mar 2017
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective May 6, 2019.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 Mar 2017
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed, effective May 6, 2019.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010