THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:10:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 36108
Fax: 416-979- 6882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Davis-Faroque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis-Faroque (CPSO#: 93260 )
Business Address: Centre for Addition and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501 Extn: 36108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-535-8501
Extension: 36108
Fax: 416-979- 6882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Davis-Faroque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Davis-Faroque (CPSO#: 93260 )
Business Address: Centre for Addition and Mental Health
1051 Queen Street West
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
416-535-8501 Extn: 36108

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DAVIS-FAROQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS-FAROQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DAVIS-FAROQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS-FAROQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010