THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:31:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Christine Golas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Golas (CPSO#: 93266 )
Business Address: CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
6218 - 80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 30400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 583-1296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Christine Golas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Golas (CPSO#: 93266 )
Business Address: CAMH, Geriatric Mental Health
Outpatient Clinics
Ground Floor, Labatt Entrance
6218 - 80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 30400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA CHRISTINE GOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA CHRISTINE GOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010