THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakefront Clinics
550 Queens Quay West
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Fax: (647) 347-9348
Address: Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 0A7
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: 6476895880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aamir Saleem Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haq (CPSO#: 93267 )
Business Address: 220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 0A7
(416) 626-2138
Business Address: Lakefront Clinics
14-550 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
(647) 347-0576

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakefront Clinics
550 Queens Quay West
Unit 14
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 347-0576
Fax: (647) 347-9348
Address: Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 0A7
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: 6476895880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aamir Saleem Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haq (CPSO#: 93267 )
Business Address: 220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 0A7
(416) 626-2138
Business Address: Lakefront Clinics
14-550 Queens Quay West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3M8
(647) 347-0576

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAMIR SALEEM HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAMIR SALEEM HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010