THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:55:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General & Marine
Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Matte (CPSO#: 93271 )
Business Address: Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General & Marine
Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Matte (CPSO#: 93271 )
Business Address: Collingwood General & Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
(705) 445-2550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM LAURIER MATTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM LAURIER MATTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010