THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CNC medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-0079
Fax: (705) 523-1414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Nizzero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nizzero (CPSO#: 93274 )
Business Address: CNC Medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5H5
(705) 222-0079
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CNC medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-0079
Fax: (705) 523-1414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Nizzero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nizzero (CPSO#: 93274 )
Business Address: CNC Medical
2416 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5H5
(705) 222-0079
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN LOUIS NIZZERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZZERO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN LOUIS NIZZERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIZZERO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010