THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Family Health Organization
Room 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Doiron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doiron (CPSO#: 93304 )
Business Address: Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 344-8475

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Family Health Organization
Room 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Doiron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doiron (CPSO#: 93304 )
Business Address: Suite 470
63 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 344-8475

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYJO DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYJO DOIRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010