THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:03:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 273-4100
Extension: 3
Fax: 519 273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARUSCAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORP
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maruscak (CPSO#: 93308 )
Business Address: 297142 29th Line
297142 29th Line
Lakeside Ontario N0M 2G0
5197772611

Corporation Name: Maruscak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford Ontario N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 273-4100
Extension: 3
Fax: 519 273-3208

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARUSCAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORP
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maruscak (CPSO#: 93308 )
Business Address: 297142 29th Line
297142 29th Line
Lakeside Ontario N0M 2G0
5197772611

Corporation Name: Maruscak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ANDREW MARUSCAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARUSCAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM ANDREW MARUSCAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARUSCAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010