THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:07:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON L1H 3X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057230036
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 99 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
Phone: 905-885-2626
Fax: 905-885-2646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasir H. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan (CPSO#: 93320 )
Business Address: 115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON L1H 3X7
905-723-0036

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON L1H 3X7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057230036
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 99 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
Phone: 905-885-2626
Fax: 905-885-2646

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasir H. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Khan (CPSO#: 93320 )
Business Address: 115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON L1H 3X7
905-723-0036

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASIR H KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YASIR H KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010