THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:40:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Department of Pathology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 34531
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zanobia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Khan (CPSO#: 93339 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Department of Pathology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055768711
Extension: 34531
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zanobia Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Khan (CPSO#: 93339 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZANOBIA FAYYAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZANOBIA FAYYAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010