THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore Family Medicine
Suite 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 503-4111
Fax: (705) 503-5111
Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kozanczyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kozanczyn (CPSO#: 93344 )
Business Address: 11 Victoria Street
Suite 216
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
(705) 503-4111
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
(705) 728-9802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeshore Family Medicine
Suite 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 503-4111
Fax: (705) 503-5111
Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kozanczyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kozanczyn (CPSO#: 93344 )
Business Address: 11 Victoria Street
Suite 216
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
(705) 503-4111
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 6T3
(705) 728-9802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTA RACHAEL KOZANCZYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZANCZYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTA RACHAEL KOZANCZYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZANCZYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Apr 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010