THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162977277
Fax: 4162994842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAVID MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McFarlane (CPSO#: 93357 )
Business Address: 64 Dovercourt Road
Toronto Ontario M6J 3C3
9024996605

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162977277
Fax: 4162994842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAVID MCFARLANE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McFarlane (CPSO#: 93357 )
Business Address: 64 Dovercourt Road
Toronto Ontario M6J 3C3
9024996605

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JASON MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JASON MCFARLANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCFARLANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010