THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 102-500 Claridge Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136996842
Fax: 6134545900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Brulotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brulotte (CPSO#: 93404 )
Business Address: 2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1T 1N8
(613) 244-4400
Business Address: 570 Lacolle Way
Orléans Ontario K4A 0N9
(613) 830-8388
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2430
Business Address: 705 Cotton Mill Street
Suite 109
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 209-4051
Business Address: 102-500 Claridge Dr
Nepean ON K2J 3G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 102-500 Claridge Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J 3G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136996842
Fax: 6134545900

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Brulotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brulotte (CPSO#: 93404 )
Business Address: 2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1T 1N8
(613) 244-4400
Business Address: 570 Lacolle Way
Orléans Ontario K4A 0N9
(613) 830-8388
Business Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2430
Business Address: 705 Cotton Mill Street
Suite 109
Cornwall Ontario K6H 7K7
(613) 209-4051
Business Address: 102-500 Claridge Dr
Nepean ON K2J 3G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC BRULOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULOTTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC BRULOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRULOTTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010