THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 01:38:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Bayview Pulmonary Services
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-430-7191
Fax: 647-430-5343
Address: Centre for Sleep & Chronobiology
Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 603-2388
Address: Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic
55 Edinborough Street, Unit 100
Windsor, ON, N8X 3C3
Windsor Ontario N8X3C3
Phone: 519-258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yajur Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Shukla (CPSO#: 93406 )
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Bayview Pulmonary Services
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
647-430-7191
Business Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Unit 100
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Address: 295 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Bayview Pulmonary Services
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-430-7191
Fax: 647-430-5343
Address: Centre for Sleep & Chronobiology
Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 603-2388
Address: Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic
55 Edinborough Street, Unit 100
Windsor, ON, N8X 3C3
Windsor Ontario N8X3C3
Phone: 519-258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yajur Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Shukla (CPSO#: 93406 )
Business Address: 240 Duncan Mill Road
Bayview Pulmonary Services
Suite 404
Toronto Ontario M3B 3S6
647-430-7191
Business Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Unit 100
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Address: 295 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M5T 1S2
(416) 603-9531

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAJUR SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAJUR SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010