THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. White (CPSO#: 93407 )
Business Address: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. White (CPSO#: 93407 )
Business Address: Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA-ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA-ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010