THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:44:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Box 255
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73224
Fax: (613) 737-8806

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Bielawska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielawska (CPSO#: 93408 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Box 255
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73224

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Box 255
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 73224
Fax: (613) 737-8806

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Bielawska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bielawska (CPSO#: 93408 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Box 255
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 73224

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA BIELAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELAWSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA BIELAWSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIELAWSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010