THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:50:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-MUMC
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-General
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Jo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jo (CPSO#: 93419 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - General
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-MUMC
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-General
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Health Sciences-Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44697
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Jo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jo (CPSO#: 93419 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - General
Department of Anesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences - Juravinski
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN JO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN JO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010