THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:38:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266744120
Fax: 2266744121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristina Lutz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lutz (CPSO#: 93434 )
Business Address: Suite 126
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(226) 674-4120
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
6160 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
2266744120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2266744120
Fax: 2266744121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristina Lutz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lutz (CPSO#: 93434 )
Business Address: Suite 126
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(226) 674-4120
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
6160 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
2266744120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA HELENE LUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTINA HELENE LUTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010