THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:10:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaif Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan (CPSO#: 93447 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Science
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Cnetre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6

Corporation Name: Dr. Alim Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan (CPSO#: 93447 ) Dr. A. Pardhan (CPSO#: 80839 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Address: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Emergency Department
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaif Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan (CPSO#: 93447 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Science
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Cnetre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C7 53
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6

Corporation Name: Dr. Alim Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan (CPSO#: 93447 ) Dr. A. Pardhan (CPSO#: 80839 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Address: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAIF PARDHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAIF PARDHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010