THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saari Medical Clinic
93 Monk Street
P0 Box 787
Chapleau, ON P0M 1K0
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 860-9859
Fax: 7059980530
Address: Chapleau General Hospital
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Phone: (705) 864-1520
Fax: (705) 864-0449
Address: Bignucolo Long Term Care Centre
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Phone: 705-864-3060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen J. Saari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saari (CPSO#: 93516 )
Business Address: 6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
(705) 864-1520
Business Address: 93 Monk Street
PO Box 787
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
(705) 860-9859

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saari Medical Clinic
93 Monk Street
P0 Box 787
Chapleau, ON P0M 1K0
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 860-9859
Fax: 7059980530
Address: Chapleau General Hospital
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Phone: (705) 864-1520
Fax: (705) 864-0449
Address: Bignucolo Long Term Care Centre
6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
Phone: 705-864-3060
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chapleau Health Services Chapleau
HOSPITAL: Chapleau Health Services
LOCATION: Chapleau

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen J. Saari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saari (CPSO#: 93516 )
Business Address: 6 Broomhead Road
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
(705) 864-1520
Business Address: 93 Monk Street
PO Box 787
Chapleau Ontario P0M 1K0
(705) 860-9859

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN SAARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN SAARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010