THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:43:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Drive
NYGH Outpatient Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
Unit E8
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-784-9366
Fax: 416-572-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Futurity Medical
745 Mt. Pleasant Road
Suite 305
Toronto, ON M4S 2N4
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shour (CPSO#: 93533 )
Business Address: PO Box 54011 Rpo Lawrence Plaza
North York ON M6A 3B7
Business Address: 305-745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N4
(416) 487-2052
Business Address: 483 Glencairn Ave
North York ON M5N 1V9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Champagne Drive
NYGH Outpatient Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
Unit E8
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-784-9366
Fax: 416-572-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Futurity Medical
745 Mt. Pleasant Road
Suite 305
Toronto, ON M4S 2N4
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shour (CPSO#: 93533 )
Business Address: PO Box 54011 Rpo Lawrence Plaza
North York ON M6A 3B7
Business Address: 305-745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto Ontario M4S 2N4
(416) 487-2052
Business Address: 483 Glencairn Ave
North York ON M5N 1V9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL SHIRA SHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL SHIRA SHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010