THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:44:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd. Unit 3E
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2563
Fax: 416-495-2426

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Sum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sum (CPSO#: 93536 )
Business Address: Unit 3E
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2563

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Rd. Unit 3E
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 495-2563
Fax: 416-495-2426

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Sum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sum (CPSO#: 93536 )
Business Address: Unit 3E
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2563

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE ABBY SUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE ABBY SUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010