THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:28:14 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Hospital Apotex LTC
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7852500
Extension: 2879
Fax: (416) 785-4221
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Palliative Care Unit (1 Centre)
381 Church Street, PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel-Malek (CPSO#: 93539 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre
Apotex 6th Floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2879
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(907) 472-7373 Extn: 7067

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Hospital Apotex LTC
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7852500
Extension: 2879
Fax: (416) 785-4221
Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Palliative Care Unit (1 Centre)
381 Church Street, PO Box 1800
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 9054727373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel-Malek (CPSO#: 93539 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre
Apotex 6th Floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2879
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(907) 472-7373 Extn: 7067

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADA ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADA ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010