THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:05:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4L3
Phone: 519 578 3510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519 744 3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Covid Assessment Clinic
50 Westmount Rd N
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6N9
Phone: 519-954-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. R. Colpitts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Colpitts (CPSO#: 93543 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4L3
Phone: 519 578 3510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: 519 744 3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Covid Assessment Clinic
50 Westmount Rd N
Waterloo Ontario N2L 6N9
Phone: 519-954-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. R. Colpitts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Colpitts (CPSO#: 93543 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE ROSEMARY COLPITTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLPITTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRAINE ROSEMARY COLPITTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLPITTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010