THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: Fantham, Neva Virginia (Used Until: 15 Dec 2015)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 478-7300
Fax: (705) 478-8884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neva Fantham-Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fantham-Tremblay (CPSO#: 93548 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 203 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
(705) 478-7300

General Information

Former Name: Fantham, Neva Virginia (Used Until: 15 Dec 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 478-7300
Fax: (705) 478-8884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neva Fantham-Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fantham-Tremblay (CPSO#: 93548 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600
Business Address: 203 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 4Y3
(705) 478-7300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVA VIRGINIA FANTHAM-TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTHAM-TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEVA VIRGINIA FANTHAM-TREMBLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTHAM-TREMBLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010