THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1605 Orleans Boulevard, Unit 3a
Orleans, Ontario
K1C 7E2
Orléans Ontario K1C 2R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)841-8500
Fax: (613)841-5310
Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Avenue
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 613-257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Ribchinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ribchinsky (CPSO#: 93553 )
Business Address: 1605 Orleans Blvd
Ottawa ON K1C 7E2
613-841-8500

Corporation Name: S. Ribchinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1605 Orleans Boulevard, Unit 3a
Orleans, Ontario
K1C 7E2
Orléans Ontario K1C 2R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)841-8500
Fax: (613)841-5310
Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Avenue
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: 613-257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Ribchinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ribchinsky (CPSO#: 93553 )
Business Address: 1605 Orleans Blvd
Ottawa ON K1C 7E2
613-841-8500

Corporation Name: S. Ribchinsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA RIBCHINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBCHINSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOFIA RIBCHINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBCHINSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010