THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 18:27:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 9056832320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D Bitonti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bitonti (CPSO#: 93556 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax Pickering Hospital
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: 9056832320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D Bitonti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bitonti (CPSO#: 93556 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ISAAC BITONTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITONTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ISAAC BITONTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITONTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010