THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:09:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Skeldon (CPSO#: 93564 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 621-9700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville Family Health Team
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 211
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Fax: (416) 621-4438

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Skeldon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Skeldon (CPSO#: 93564 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 621-9700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN CHRISTOPHER TOSHIAKI SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN CHRISTOPHER TOSHIAKI SKELDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKELDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010