THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave, East
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Phone: (905)522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact Medica One to request a copy of their medical record.
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington, ON L7R 1E2
Tel: 905-634-1625
Fax: 905-634-5332
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Charland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Charland (CPSO#: 93587 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave, East
Hamilton Ontario L8N4A6
Phone: (905)522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Nov 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact Medica One to request a copy of their medical record.
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington, ON L7R 1E2
Tel: 905-634-1625
Fax: 905-634-5332
Date Received: 05 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Charland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Charland (CPSO#: 93587 )
Business Address: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE CHARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ANDRE CHARLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010