THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 8
33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836 8558
Fax: (519) 822 0403
Address: 10-4265 Thomas Alton Blvd
Burlington ON L7M 0Z4
Phone: 9058495057
Fax: 9058495056

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dusan Sajic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sajic (CPSO#: 93599 )
Business Address: 8-33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
(519) 836-8558

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 8
33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 836 8558
Fax: (519) 822 0403
Address: 10-4265 Thomas Alton Blvd
Burlington ON L7M 0Z4
Phone: 9058495057
Fax: 9058495056

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dusan Sajic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sajic (CPSO#: 93599 )
Business Address: 8-33 Farley Drive
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
(519) 836-8558

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSAN SAJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSAN SAJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010