THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:04:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre UHN
610 University Ave
700U Rm 716
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 7522
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fallah-Rad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fallah-Rad (CPSO#: 93613 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre - UHN
610 University Avenue
OPG - 7-716
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 7522

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre UHN
610 University Ave
700U Rm 716
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 7522
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fallah-Rad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fallah-Rad (CPSO#: 93613 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre - UHN
610 University Avenue
OPG - 7-716
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 7522

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZANIN FALLAH-RAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLAH-RAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZANIN FALLAH-RAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALLAH-RAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010