THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:01:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jha, Sapna (Used Until: 15 Oct 2014)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3359 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5L 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sapna Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi (CPSO#: 93622 )
Business Address: 3359 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5L 1C6
Business Address: 405-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4

General Information

Former Name: Jha, Sapna (Used Until: 15 Oct 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3359 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5L 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sapna Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi (CPSO#: 93622 )
Business Address: 3359 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON L5L 1C6
Business Address: 405-2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAPNA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAPNA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010