THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 267
1099 Kingston Rd
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-492-4299
Fax: 416-551-6944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie (CPSO#: 93623 )
Business Address: suite 267-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 267
1099 Kingston Rd
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-492-4299
Fax: 416-551-6944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marchie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Marchie (CPSO#: 93623 )
Business Address: suite 267-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFONSE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFONSE MARCHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010