THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 13:36:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivek Bodani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bodani (CPSO#: 93656 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 301-755 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivek Bodani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bodani (CPSO#: 93656 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 301-755 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4C5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVEK PANKAJ BODANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVEK PANKAJ BODANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2024
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010