THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:43:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Ave
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353
Address: Primacy Don Mills Medical Clinic
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3C 1V4
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Escanlar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Escanlar (CPSO#: 93664 )
Business Address: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
(416) 398-7355
Business Address: 825 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3C 1V4
(416) 383-1251

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Ave
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353
Address: Primacy Don Mills Medical Clinic
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3C 1V4
Phone: (416) 383-1251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Escanlar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Escanlar (CPSO#: 93664 )
Business Address: Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3H 3V6
(416) 398-7355
Business Address: 825 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3C 1V4
(416) 383-1251

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ESCANLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESCANLAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ESCANLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESCANLAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010