THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 2K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4554
Fax: (905) 662-1468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Savatteri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Savatteri (CPSO#: 93670 )
Business Address: Suite 200
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 2K2
(905) 662-4554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 2K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-4554
Fax: (905) 662-1468

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Savatteri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Savatteri (CPSO#: 93670 )
Business Address: Suite 200
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 2K2
(905) 662-4554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAVATTERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVATTERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAVATTERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVATTERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010