THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:08:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare, Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)522-1155
Extension: 35533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley Sutton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sutton (CPSO#: 93688 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 1
100 West 5th Street
PO Box 585
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Healthcare, Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)522-1155
Extension: 35533
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wesley Sutton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Sutton (CPSO#: 93688 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Unit 1
100 West 5th Street
PO Box 585
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY FREDRICK SUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY FREDRICK SUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUTTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010