THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:46:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
McMaster Family Medicine Program, Osler Clinical Education Campus
Room 2.B.211
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehry Kianfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kianfar (CPSO#: 93701 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
McMaster Family Medicine Program - Osler Clinical Education Campus
Room 2.B.211
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0G9
(905) 451-1937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
McMaster Family Medicine Program, Osler Clinical Education Campus
Room 2.B.211
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehry Kianfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kianfar (CPSO#: 93701 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch St
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
McMaster Family Medicine Program - Osler Clinical Education Campus
Room 2.B.211
Brampton ON L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0G9
(905) 451-1937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRY JENNIFER KIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIANFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRY JENNIFER KIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIANFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010