THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:00:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAVIER CUBILLOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cubillos Salcedo (CPSO#: 93746 )
Business Address: 2339 Springridge Dr
London ON N5X 0J7
5487881212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAVIER CUBILLOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cubillos Salcedo (CPSO#: 93746 )
Business Address: 2339 Springridge Dr
London ON N5X 0J7
5487881212

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Jan 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 16 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAVIER ENRIQUE CUBILLOS SALCEDO may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAVIER ENRIQUE CUBILLOS SALCEDO may practise medicine independently in anesthesiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 25 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 25 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010