THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:34:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20B 600 Hespeler
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-2588
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Lancaster St W
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1M3
Phone: (519) 896-6699
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Binh Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Van (CPSO#: 93752 )
Business Address: 20B - 600 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8H2
(519) 267-2588
Business Address: 580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1M3
(519) 896-6699

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20B 600 Hespeler
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 267-2588
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Lancaster St W
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1M3
Phone: (519) 896-6699
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 19 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Binh Van Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Van (CPSO#: 93752 )
Business Address: 20B - 600 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 8H2
(519) 267-2588
Business Address: 580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2K 1M3
(519) 896-6699

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
22 Oct 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 22 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Van to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. NGOC BINH VAN
("Dr. Van")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Van, certificate of registration number 93752, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 7216284 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Van, undertake that I will not practise emergency medicine in any
jurisdiction until each of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide the College with proof that I have successfully completed
the University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
Experience ("SEME") program.

(6) I, Dr. Van, undertake that upon my return to the practice of emergency
medicine, I shall, at minimum, submit to a reassessment of my emergency
medicine practice within six (6) months.

(8) I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". I also undertake to
abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice
and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy, a copy of which is attached hereto
as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(9) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
emergency medicine practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
monitoring agreement with the College.

(11) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(13) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van
engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
the practice of emergency medicine. In the face of these
allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency
medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the
University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
Experience ("SEME") program.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Van, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from October 22, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Van to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. NGOC BINH VAN
("Dr. Van")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Van, certificate of registration number 93752, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
bearing File Number 7216284 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my emergency medicine
practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) I, Dr. Van, undertake that I will not practise emergency medicine in any
jurisdiction until each of the following conditions have been met:

(a) I provide the College with proof that I have successfully completed
the University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
Experience ("SEME") program.

(6) I, Dr. Van, undertake that upon my return to the practice of emergency
medicine, I shall, at minimum, submit to a reassessment of my emergency
medicine practice within six (6) months.

(8) I, Dr. Van, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". I also undertake to
abide by the College's "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice
and/or Re-entering Practice" Policy, a copy of which is attached hereto
as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(9) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
emergency medicine practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things:

(a) request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
being placed upon my certificate of registration; and

(b) request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
monitoring agreement with the College.

(11) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(12) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(13) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College.

(14) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van
engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
the practice of emergency medicine. In the face of these
allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency
medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the
University of Toronto's Supplemental Emergency Medicine
Experience ("SEME") program.

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Van, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Van, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective October 22, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the University of Toronto’s Supplemental Emergency Medicine Experience (“SEME”) program. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, Dr. Van has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, Dr. Van has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 22 Oct 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ngoc Binh Van to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective October 22, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Van engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of emergency medicine. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Van has ceased to practise emergency medicine in all jurisdictions until he completes the University of Toronto’s Supplemental Emergency Medicine Experience (“SEME”) program. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, Dr. Van has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Effective December 18, 2019, Dr. Van has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010